EP0575947 - Color electrophotographic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terada, Hiroshi 8-25, Mayumi 4-chome Ikoma-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Hajime 35-202, Nishitanaka-cho 4-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 93109902.2 | 22.06.1993 | [1993/52] | Priority number, date | JP19920165828 | 24.06.1992 Original published format: JP 16582892 | JP19920176458 | 03.07.1992 Original published format: JP 17645892 | [1993/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0575947 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0575947 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/01 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
G03G15/0131 (EP,US);
G03G15/0163 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0112 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/52] | Title | German: | Elektrophotographisches Farbegerät | [1993/52] | English: | Color electrophotographic apparatus | [1993/52] | French: | Appareil électrophotographique couleur | [1993/52] | Examination procedure | 22.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/52] | 24.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP62287264 ; | [YD]US4905048 (SUZUKI MINORU [JP]); | [YP]EP0515053 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [E]EP0552410 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US5081506 (BOROSTYAN STEPHEN [US]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 178 (P-708)26 May 1988 & JP-A-62 287 264 ( CANON ) 14 December 1987, & JP62287264 A 19871214 |