EP0578062 - Control system for driving an object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUNNY CO. LTD. No.29-1, Toyotamakita 5-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Kawabata, Akira No.44-1, Amanuma 1-chome Suginami-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | For all designated states SUNNY CO. LTD. No.29-1, Toyotamakita 5-chome Nerima-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Kawabata, Akira No.44-1, Amanuma 1-chome Suginami-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawabata, Akira N . 44-1, Amanuma 1-chome Suginami-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1994/02] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Postfach 3055 90014 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1994/02] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH Postfach 3055 D-90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93110091.1 | 24.06.1993 | [1994/02] | Priority number, date | deleted | [1995/03] |
Former [1994/02] | deleted | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0578062 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0578062 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/35 | [1994/02] | CPC: |
G05B19/358 (EP);
E05Y2400/342 (EP);
G05B2219/36464 (EP);
G05B2219/36465 (EP);
G05B2219/36466 (EP);
G05B2219/36511 (EP);
G05B2219/36519 (EP);
G05B2219/37261 (EP);
G05B2219/37323 (EP);
G05B2219/37622 (EP);
G05B2219/37624 (EP);
G05B2219/41099 (EP);
G05B2219/45242 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/02] | Title | German: | Steuerungssystem zum Antreiben eines Objektes | [1994/02] | English: | Control system for driving an object | [1994/02] | French: | Système de commande pour entraîner un objet | [1994/02] | Examination procedure | 12.07.1994 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 12.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01, 02 | 23.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 10.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/26] | 04.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1999/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4005255 (VDO ADOLF SCHINDLING AG) [X] 1,9 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 12 * * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 32 * [Y] 2-8,10-17; | [Y]BE626389 (ZAVODY PRUMYSLOVE AUTOMATISACE NARODNI PODNIK) [Y] 2,3 * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 4 * * page 4, line 19 - line 21 *; | [Y]EP0380707 (FANUC) [Y] 3,4,13 * claims 1,3 *; | [Y]EP0462539 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) [Y] 4 * claim 2 *; | [Y]EP0426577 (SIMU) [Y] 7,8 * claims 1,2,7 *; | [Y]GB2081927 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC) [Y] 7,8,16,17 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0499884 (SIEMENS) [Y] 5-8,14-17 * column 1, line 28 - column 2, line 52; claims 1,4,5 * * column 3, line 53 - line 58 * * column 4, line 23 - line 39 *; | [Y]EP0433083 (ZYMARK CORPORATION) [Y] 10-12 * column 4, line 19 - column 6, line 16; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0356133 (TEIJIN SEIKI CO.) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [A]US4638433 (W.R. SCHINDLER) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |