EP0576021 - Lead on chip structure for semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.1999 [1999/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | For all designated states TOSHIBA MICRO-ELECTRONICS CORPORATION 25-1, Ekimae-hon-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | ||
For all designated states TOSHIBA MICRO-ELECTRONICS CORPORATION 25-1, Ekimae-hon-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states TOSHIBA MICRO-ELECTRONICS CORPORATION 25-1, Ekimae-hon-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koyanagi, Masaru 3-3-5-304, Azamino, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Muraoka, Kazuyoshi 2-6-1-303, Choja-Machi, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamada, Minoru 102, Aoba-so, 2-707, Marukotori, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patent PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/52] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93110145.5 | 24.06.1993 | [1993/52] | Priority number, date | JP19920166168 | 24.06.1992 Original published format: JP 16616892 | [1993/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0576021 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0576021 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/495, H01L23/50 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
H01L23/50 (EP,US);
H01L23/4951 (EP,US);
H01L2224/451 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4826 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/451, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/52] | Title | German: | Struktur von Anschlussleiter auf Chip für Halbleiterbauelement | [1993/52] | English: | Lead on chip structure for semiconductor device | [1993/52] | French: | Structure de connexion sur puce pour dispositif à semiconducteur | [1993/52] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/52] | 12.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0361825 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [Y]US4967261 (NIKI KENICHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0400324 (IBM [US]); | [A]US5068712 (MURAKAMI GEN [JP], et al); | [Y]US5072280 (MATSUKURA TAKUMI [JP]); | [XP]EP0533589 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) |