EP0582078 - Superluminescent edge emitting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.2001 [2001/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1994/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lebby, Michael S. 2900 W.Highland Street, No. 221 Chandler, Arizona 85224 / US | 02 /
Ackley, Donald E. 317, Goat Hill Road Lambertville, NJ 08530 / US | [1994/06] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [1994/06] | Hudson, Peter David MOTOROLA European Intellectual Property Operations Jays Close Viables Industrial Estate Basingstoke Hants RG22 4PD / GB | Application number, filing date | 93110159.6 | 25.06.1993 | [1994/06] | Priority number, date | US19920925053 | 05.08.1992 Original published format: US 925053 | [1994/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0582078 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0582078 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00 | [1994/06] | CPC: |
H01L33/105 (EP,US);
H01L33/0045 (EP,US);
H01L33/465 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/06] | Title | German: | Seitlich emittierende Superlumineszenzdiode | [1999/24] | English: | Superluminescent edge emitting device | [1994/06] | French: | Diode superluminescente du type à émission latérale | [1994/06] |
Former [1994/06] | Superlumineszenzdiode mit Kartenemission | Examination procedure | 01.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/39] | 20.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/31] | Request for further processing for: | 25.09.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 25.09.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8503809 (CODENOLL TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]); | [A]US4896195 (JANSEN MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US4952019 (EVANS GARY A [US], et al); | [A]FR2649537 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIQUE LAB [FR]) | [X] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 33, no. 1A, June 1990, NEW YORK US pages 403 - 404 'Pillbox quantum well light-emitting diode' | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. vol. 60, no. 8, 24 February 1992, NEW YORK US pages 921 - 923 E.F. SCHUBERT ET AL. 'Resonant cavity light-emitting diode' | Examination | - THORNTON R L ET AL., "High reflectivity GaAs-AlGaAs mirrors fabricated by metalorganic chemical vapor deposition", APPLID PHYSICS LETTERS, NEW YORK, US, (19841115), vol. 45, no. 10, pages 1028 - 1030, XP001620409 |