EP0568110 - Free standing mop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IE | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYGIENE-TECHNIK INC. 4743 Christie Drive Beamsville Ontario L0R 2C0 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states HYGIENE-TECHNIK INC. 4743 Christie Drive Beamsville, Ontario L0R 2C0 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ophardt, Heiner 3931 Vineyard Cres Vineland, Ontario, L0R 2CO / CA | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93110220.6 | 25.06.1993 | [1993/44] | Priority number, date | CA19932087929 | 22.01.1993 Original published format: CA 2087929 | [1993/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0568110 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0568110 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0568110 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A47L13/24, A47L13/255, A47L13/258, B25G3/38 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
A47L13/253 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/44] | A47L13/255 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/44] | Title | German: | Stehfähiger Mop | [1993/44] | English: | Free standing mop | [1993/44] | French: | Balai stable en position verticale | [1993/44] | Examination procedure | 15.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/36] | 31.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.09.1997 | BE | 10.09.1997 | CH | 10.09.1997 | DK | 10.09.1997 | GR | 10.09.1997 | LI | 10.09.1997 | NL | 10.09.1997 | PT | 10.12.1997 | SE | 10.12.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/10] | AT | 10.09.1997 | |
BE | 10.09.1997 | ||
CH | 10.09.1997 | ||
DK | 10.09.1997 | ||
GR | 10.09.1997 | ||
IE | 10.09.1997 | ||
LI | 10.09.1997 | ||
PT | 10.12.1997 | ||
SE | 10.12.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 10.09.1997 | |
BE | 10.09.1997 | ||
CH | 10.09.1997 | ||
DK | 10.09.1997 | ||
GR | 10.09.1997 | ||
LI | 10.09.1997 | ||
PT | 10.12.1997 | ||
SE | 10.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/43] | AT | 10.09.1997 | |
BE | 10.09.1997 | ||
CH | 10.09.1997 | ||
DK | 10.09.1997 | ||
LI | 10.09.1997 | ||
PT | 10.12.1997 | ||
SE | 10.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 10.09.1997 | |
BE | 10.09.1997 | ||
DK | 10.09.1997 | ||
PT | 10.12.1997 | ||
SE | 10.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/24] | AT | 10.09.1997 | |
BE | 10.09.1997 | ||
PT | 10.12.1997 | ||
SE | 10.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/21] | AT | 10.09.1997 | |
BE | 10.09.1997 | ||
SE | 10.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 10.09.1997 | |
SE | 10.12.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE64748 (GIESSMANN FRANZ [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2887710 (MAHONEY FREDERICK G) [A] 1; | [DA]US3533122 (HESENER WALTER) [DA] 1* column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 15; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4165550 (BURKE FREDERICK A [US]) [A] 1 * column A *; | [A]GB1601800 (GOUGH A J) [A] 1 * column 3, line 52 - column 5, line 13; figure 2 * |