EP0579018 - Process for production of a metal oxide layer, vacuum treatment apparatus for the process and article coated with at least one metal oxide layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BALZERS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 9496 Balzers / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | For all designated states BALZERS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 9496 Balzers / LI | ||
Former [1994/03] | For all designated states BALZERS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT FL-9496 Balzers / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peter, Günter, Dr. Lindenweg 7 CH-8889 Plons / CH | [1994/03] | Representative(s) | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Patentanwälte Postfach 8032 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/03] | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Patentanwälte, Siewerdtstrasse 95, Postfach CH-8050 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 93110252.9 | 28.06.1993 | [1994/03] | Priority number, date | CH19920002095 | 02.07.1992 Original published format: CH 209592 | [1994/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0579018 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0579018 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/54, H01J37/305 | [1994/03] | CPC: |
C23C14/54 (EP,US);
C23C14/0021 (EP,US);
H01J2237/182 (EP,US);
H01J2237/2001 (EP,US);
H01J2237/3132 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1994/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Metalloxidschicht, Vakuumbehandlungsanlage hierfür sowie mit mindestens einer Metalloxidschicht beschichteter Teil | [1994/03] | English: | Process for production of a metal oxide layer, vacuum treatment apparatus for the process and article coated with at least one metal oxide layer | [1994/03] | French: | Procédé de production d'une couche d'oxyde métallique, appareillage de traitement sous vide pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé et article revêtu d'au moins une couche d'oxyde métallique | [1994/03] | Examination procedure | 14.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/11] | 14.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/38] | Request for further processing for: | 26.08.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.09.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.09.1998 | GB | 30.09.1998 | NL | 30.09.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | GB | 30.09.1998 | |
NL | 30.09.1998 | ||
FR | 26.02.1999 | ||
Former [1999/36] | GB | 30.09.1998 | |
FR | 26.02.1999 | ||
Former [1999/30] | GB | 30.09.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2341668 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0005641 (GOULD INC [US]); | [A]GB2158104 (DIESEL KIKI CO); | [X]EP0302506 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [X]WO9002215 (UNIV MINNESOTA [US]) | [A] - REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS Bd. 57, Nr. 5, Mai 1986, NEW YORK US Seiten 937 - 940 SEVENHANS ET AL. 'Mass Spectrometer Controlled Electron Beam Evaporation Synthesis of Multilayered Materials' |