EP0578114 - Pedal angle sensor for vehicles with internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.11.1995 [1995/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIERBURG GMBH Alfred-Pierburg-Strasse 1 41460 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | For all designated states PIERBURG GMBH Alfred-Pierburg-Strasse 1 D-41460 Neuss / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiesjahn, Klaus Achenbachstrasse 79 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | [1994/02] | Application number, filing date | 93110413.7 | 30.06.1993 | [1994/02] | Priority number, date | DE19924222680 | 10.07.1992 Original published format: DE 4222680 | [1994/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0578114 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0578114 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60K26/02 | [1994/02] | CPC: |
G05G5/03 (EP);
B60K26/021 (EP);
F02D2009/0269 (EP);
F02D2009/0284 (EP);
F16H59/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/02] | Title | German: | Pedalwertgeber für Fahrzeuge mit einer Brennkraftmaschine | [1994/02] | English: | Pedal angle sensor for vehicles with internal combustion engine | [1994/02] | French: | Capteur d'angle d'accélérateur pour véhicules à moteur à combustion interne | [1994/02] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 24.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2843456 ; | [A]FR2562010 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]EP0092640 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) |