EP0577093 - Carrying bags [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ambasz, Emilio Salguero 545 1177 Buenos Aires / AR | [1997/24] |
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states Ambasz, Emilio 295 Central Park West New York, N.Y. 10024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/01] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Dieter Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93110422.8 | 29.06.1993 | [1994/01] | Priority number, date | US19920908184 | 01.07.1992 Original published format: US 908184 | [1994/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0577093 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0577093 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A45C7/00 | [1994/01] | CPC: |
A45C7/0022 (EP,US);
A45C5/00 (KR);
A45C7/0063 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1362 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/01] | Title | German: | Tragetaschen | [1994/01] | English: | Carrying bags | [1994/01] | French: | Sacs de transport | [1994/01] | Examination procedure | 17.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/33] | 29.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.08.1997 | CH | 13.08.1997 | DK | 13.08.1997 | GR | 13.08.1997 | LI | 13.08.1997 | SE | 13.11.1997 | PT | 14.11.1997 | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/43] | BE | 13.08.1997 | |
CH | 13.08.1997 | ||
DK | 13.08.1997 | ||
LI | 13.08.1997 | ||
SE | 13.11.1997 | ||
PT | 14.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/30] | BE | 13.08.1997 | |
DK | 13.08.1997 | ||
SE | 13.11.1997 | ||
PT | 14.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/24] | BE | 13.08.1997 | |
SE | 13.11.1997 | ||
PT | 14.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/21] | BE | 13.08.1997 | |
SE | 13.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | SE | 13.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3256919 (OGLETREE MARVIN A); | [A]DE2130778 (GOLD ZACK WERKE AG); | [A]US3819033 (HUEBER E); | [A]US3902541 (WARDWELL GEORGE D); | [A]DE2825325 (KOFFERFAB BERMAS); | [A]US4811769 (PHARES ROBERT R [US]) |