EP0580006 - Anti-aquaplaning system for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.1996 [1996/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 74072 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | For all designated states TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 D-74072 Heilbronn / DE | ||
Former [1994/04] | For all designated states Deutsche Aerospace AG D-81663 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bodier, Rüdiger Obere Dorfstrasse 5A D-85653 Aying / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Hartmut, Dr. Lerchenweg 15 D-85238 Petershausen / DE | [1994/04] | Application number, filing date | 93110749.4 | 06.07.1993 | [1994/04] | Priority number, date | DE19924224452 | 24.07.1992 Original published format: DE 4224452 | [1994/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0580006 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60B39/10 | [1994/04] | CPC: |
B60B39/10 (EP);
B60T2210/13 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1994/04] | Title | German: | Antiaquaplaningsystem für ein Strassenfahrzeug | [1994/04] | English: | Anti-aquaplaning system for a motor vehicle | [1994/04] | French: | Système anti-aquaplaning pour véhicule routier | [1994/04] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 22.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 05.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/48] | 28.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE868856 (VON HAYN) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]US2028334 (KEECH) [X] 1-3 * page 1 - page 2, column L, line 71; figure - *; | [A]US3889991 (KENT HEWITT) [A] 4 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 45; figure - *; | [A]DE2214313 (DAIMLER-BENZ) [A] 1 * page 5, line 17 - page 8, line 18; figure - *; | [ADP]DE4115367 (MESSERSCHMITT) [ADP] 1 * the whole document * |