EP0580030 - Thermoplastic resin film with excellent offset printability and offset prints thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.1996 [1996/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OJI YUKA GOSEISHI CO., LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [1994/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asami, Koichi, c/o Oji Yuka Goseishi Co., Ltd. 23, Oazatouwada, Kamisu-cho Kashima-gun, Ibaraki / JP | 02 /
Amagai, Hironobu, c/o Oji Yuka Goseishi Co., Ltd. 23, Oazatouwada, Kamisu-cho Kashima-gun, Ibaraki / JP | 03 /
Saitoh, Yukio c/o Mitsubishi Petrochem. Co., Ltd., 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie / JP | 04 /
Itoh, Isao c/o Mitsubishi Petrochem. Co., Ltd., 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie / JP | [1994/04] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/04] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93110949.0 | 08.07.1993 | [1994/04] | Priority number, date | JP19920181331 | 08.07.1992 Original published format: JP 18133192 | [1994/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0580030 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0580030 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, B41M1/26 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
B41M5/5245 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/044 (EP,US);
C08J2433/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31721 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1994/04] | D21H19/00, D21H19/58, B41M5/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/04] | Title | German: | Thermoplastischer Harzfilm mit verbesserter Offset-Bedruckbarkeit und daraus hergestellte Offsetdrucke | [1995/52] | English: | Thermoplastic resin film with excellent offset printability and offset prints thereof | [1994/04] | French: | Film de résine thermoplastique à excelllentes propriétés pour l'impression offset et imprimés offset ainsi fabriqués | [1994/04] |
Former [1994/04] | Thermoplastischer Harzfilm mit verbesserter offset-Drückbarkeit und daraus hergestellter offset-Druckschrift | Examination procedure | 01.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 16.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0423829 (OJI PAPER CO [JP]) [A] 1-20* claims 1-5 * |