EP0578261 - Proximity switch with a magnetic field sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jansseune, Luc Arno-Assmann-Strasse 11 D-81739 München / DE | [1994/02] | Application number, filing date | 93111042.3 | 09.07.1993 | [1994/02] | Priority number, date | DE19924222616 | 09.07.1992 Original published format: DE 4222616 | DE19924227831 | 21.08.1992 Original published format: DE 4227831 | DE19924237929 | 10.11.1992 Original published format: DE 4237929 | [1994/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0578261 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/95 | [1994/02] | CPC: |
H03K17/9517 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/02] | Title | German: | Näherungsschalter mit einem Magnetfeld-Sensor | [1994/02] | English: | Proximity switch with a magnetic field sensor | [1994/02] | French: | Commutateur de proximité avec un capteur manétique | [1994/02] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/35] | 04.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/16] | 13.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8802579 ; | [X]DE2532981 ; | [A]DE2916500 ; | [A]EP0283291 ; | [A]US4603295 |