EP0580053 - A method of producing plugs or sockets for electrical coupling devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reichinger, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Schwabacher Strasse 16 91126 Rednitzhembach / DE | [1997/48] |
Former [1994/41] | For all designated states Reichinger, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Schwabacher Strasse 16 D-91126 Rednitzhembach / DE | ||
Former [1994/04] | For all designated states Leonische Drahtwerke AG Marienstrasse 7 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reichinger, Gerhard Schwabacher Strasse 6 D-91126 Rednitzhembach / DE | 02 /
Köttgen, Hans Hartershofen 84 D-91628 Steinsfeld / DE | [1994/04] | Representative(s) | Tergau, Enno Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/04] | Tergau, Enno, Dipl.-Ing. Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 D-90482 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93111119.9 | 12.07.1993 | [1994/04] | Priority number, date | DE19924223725 | 18.07.1992 Original published format: DE 4223725 | [1994/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0580053 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0580053 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/504, H01R43/20 | [1994/04] | CPC: |
H01R43/20 (EP);
H01R13/504 (EP);
H01R43/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, NL, PT [1994/15] |
Former [1994/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Steckern oder Kupplungsdosen für elektrische Steckvorrichtungen | [1994/04] | English: | A method of producing plugs or sockets for electrical coupling devices | [1994/04] | French: | Méthode pour fabriquer des fiches ou douilles pour dispositifs de connexion électrique | [1994/04] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, LI, MC, SE | 08.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/18] | 06.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.09.1993 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.1993 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.1993 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.1993 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.09.1993 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 26.11.1997 | FR | 26.11.1997 | GR | 26.11.1997 | IT | 26.11.1997 | NL | 26.11.1997 | PT | 26.02.1998 | ES | 21.05.1998 | LU | 12.07.1998 | IE | 14.07.1998 | BE | 31.07.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/38] | DK | 26.11.1997 | |
GR | 26.11.1997 | ||
IT | 26.11.1997 | ||
NL | 26.11.1997 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
FR | 24.04.1998 | ||
ES | 21.05.1998 | ||
LU | 12.07.1998 | ||
IE | 14.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
Former [2004/04] | DK | 26.11.1997 | |
GR | 26.11.1997 | ||
IT | 26.11.1997 | ||
NL | 26.11.1997 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
FR | 24.04.1998 | ||
ES | 21.05.1998 | ||
IE | 14.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
Former [2003/07] | DK | 26.11.1997 | |
GR | 26.11.1997 | ||
IT | 26.11.1997 | ||
NL | 26.11.1997 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
FR | 24.04.1998 | ||
IE | 14.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
Former [2002/10] | DK | 26.11.1997 | |
GR | 26.11.1997 | ||
IT | 26.11.1997 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
FR | 24.04.1998 | ||
IE | 14.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 26.11.1997 | |
GR | 26.11.1997 | ||
IE | 26.11.1997 | ||
IT | 26.11.1997 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
FR | 24.04.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
LU | 31.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 26.11.1997 | |
IE | 26.11.1997 | ||
IT | 26.11.1997 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
FR | 24.04.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | DK | 26.11.1997 | |
IE | 26.11.1997 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
FR | 24.04.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/16] | DK | 26.11.1997 | |
IE | 26.11.1997 | ||
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
FR | 24.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | DK | 26.11.1997 | |
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
FR | 24.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/37] | DK | 26.11.1997 | |
PT | 26.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | DK | 26.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3392070 (GROPP WALTER E); | [A]GB1400675 (AMP INC); | [A]FR2282772 (KABEL METALLWERKE GHH [DE]) |