EP0634347 - A scraping device for belt conveyors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.09.1997 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 12.11.1997 [1997/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Campanile, Luigi Via Manganario No. 51 I-84100 Salerno / IT | [1995/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Robba, Eugenio, et al Studio "INTERPATENT" via Caboto 35 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | Robba, Eugenio, et al Studio "INTERPATENT" via Caboto 35 I-10129 Turin / IT | Application number, filing date | 93111272.6 | 14.07.1993 | [1995/03] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0634347 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65G45/12 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
B65G45/12 (EP,US);
B65G45/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/03] | Title | German: | Kratzvorrichtung für Bandförderer | [1995/03] | English: | A scraping device for belt conveyors | [1995/03] | French: | Dispositif de raclage pour convoyeurs à bande | [1995/03] | Examination procedure | 19.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/34] | 31.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/46] | 29.06.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0338118 (NIHON TSUSHO KK [JP]); | [A]DE9102271U ; | [A]DE1265652 (MEYER & CO G M B H MASCHF); | [A]EP0458118 (BECKER WALTER GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE2754263 (UNIROYAL LTD); | [A]GB2055730 (FENNER CO LTD J H); | [A]US4944386 (SWINDERMAN ROBERT T [US]); | [A]DE1072190 |