EP0581151 - Device for monitoring a sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miener, Björn, Dipl.-Ing. An der Kreuzbreite D-93051 Regensburg / DE | 02 /
Foehr, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Strassackerweg 4 D-93073 Neutraubling / DE | [1994/05] | Application number, filing date | 93111485.4 | 16.07.1993 | [1994/05] | Priority number, date | EP19920112548 | 22.07.1992 Original published format: EP 92112548 | [1994/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0581151 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01D3/08, F02D41/24 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
F02D41/28 (EP);
F02D41/222 (EP);
G01D3/08 (EP);
F02D2041/227 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/05] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Überwachen eines Sensors | [1994/05] | English: | Device for monitoring a sensor | [1994/05] | French: | Dispositif pour contrôler un capteur | [1994/05] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 24.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.08.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/02] | 22.08.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5079946 (MOTAMEDI ET AL) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 19 - column 6, line 19; figures 1,4 *; | [X]GB2130755 (FUJI J K K) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 70 - page 3, line 5; figure 2 *; | [X]GB2125565 (HONDA) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]EP0203575 (HONDA) [A] 3 * ZUSAMMENFASSUNG:SEITE 5 ZEIL 10-21* |