EP0643223 - Method and arrangement for sealing a shaft passage in gear pumps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maag Pump Systems Textron AG Hardstrasse 219 8023 Zürich / CH | [1997/35] |
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states Maag Pump Systems AG Hardstrasse 219 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stehr, Roger Gartematt 8 CH-8180 Bülach / CH | 02 /
Schaich, Martin Urdorferstrasse 32a CH-8952 Schlieren / CH | 03 /
Mischler, Eduard Im Lettenhau 9 CH-8105 Regensdorf / CH | 04 /
Schmid, Christian Sonnhalde 3 CH-5607 Hägglingen / CH | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Patentanwälte Postfach 8032 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Patentanwälte, Siewerdtstrasse 95, Postfach CH-8050 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 93111510.9 | 17.07.1993 | [1995/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0643223 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0643223 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F04C15/00, F04C13/00 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
F04C15/0038 (EP);
F04C13/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/18] |
Former [1995/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zum Dichten einer Wellendurchführung bei Zahnradpumpen | [1995/11] | English: | Method and arrangement for sealing a shaft passage in gear pumps | [1995/11] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'étanchéité de traversée d'arbre pour pompes à engrenages | [1995/11] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1994 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GR, IE, LU, MC, PT | 05.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/22] | 04.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.08.1994 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.1994 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.1994 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.1994 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.08.1994 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 04.02.1998 | FR | 04.02.1998 | IT | 04.02.1998 | NL | 04.02.1998 | DK | 04.05.1998 | SE | 04.05.1998 | AT | 17.07.1998 | BE | 31.07.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/45] | ES | 04.02.1998 | |
IT | 04.02.1998 | ||
NL | 04.02.1998 | ||
DK | 04.05.1998 | ||
SE | 04.05.1998 | ||
FR | 03.07.1998 | ||
AT | 17.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
Former [2003/07] | ES | 04.02.1998 | |
IT | 04.02.1998 | ||
NL | 04.02.1998 | ||
SE | 04.05.1998 | ||
FR | 03.07.1998 | ||
AT | 17.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
Former [2002/25] | ES | 04.02.1998 | |
IT | 04.02.1998 | ||
SE | 04.05.1998 | ||
FR | 03.07.1998 | ||
AT | 17.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
Former [2000/24] | IT | 04.02.1998 | |
SE | 04.05.1998 | ||
FR | 03.07.1998 | ||
AT | 17.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 04.02.1998 | |
SE | 04.05.1998 | ||
FR | 03.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | SE | 04.05.1998 | |
FR | 03.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.07.1998 | ||
Former [1998/52] | SE | 04.05.1998 | |
FR | 03.07.1998 | ||
Former [1998/43] | SE | 04.05.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3976405 (GEIGER KENNETH DANIEL, et al) [Y] 1,2,7,8 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 18 * * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 30; figure - *; | [A]DE3135037 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF [DE]) [A] 2,6 * page 8, paragraph L * * page 9, line 1 - line 5 * * page 10, line 6 - line 21 * * page 12, paragraph L; figure 2 * * page 13 *; | [YA]US4575100 (HAY II ROBERT A [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,7,8 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 30; figure 1 * [A] 4,5; | [A]WO8908782 (JOHNSON PUMP AB [SE]) [A] 3,4 * page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 16; figure 1A ** page 10, line 3 - line 7 * |