EP0582128 - Controlling or adjusting the selection and/or the progress of programmes, in particular of washing machine programmes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.1995 [1995/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSG-Schalttechnik GmbH & Co. KG Meisterstrasse 19 D-72336 Balingen / DE | [1994/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Izard, Ramon Valls AV. J.M. Marcet, nr. 1 E-08193 Bellaterra, Barcelona / ES | 02 /
Piazuelo, Carlos Valenti Crta. Barcelona, nr. 34 Bajos Corbera de Llobregat, Barcelona / ES | [1994/06] | Representative(s) | Otte, Peter Otte & Jakelski Patentanwälte, Mollenbachstrasse 37 71229 Leonberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Otte, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Mollenbachstrasse 37 D-71229 Leonberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93111643.8 | 21.07.1993 | [1994/06] | Priority number, date | DE19924225846 | 05.08.1992 Original published format: DE 4225846 | [1994/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0582128 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/00, G05B19/04, G05B19/10 | [1994/06] | CPC: |
G05B19/0426 (EP,US);
D06F34/28 (EP,US);
D06F2105/58 (EP,US);
G05B2219/21004 (EP);
G05B2219/2633 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/06] | Title | German: | Steuerung oder Regelung für die Einstellung und/oder den Ablauf von Programmen, insbesondere Waschprogrammen bei Waschmaschinen | [1994/06] | English: | Controlling or adjusting the selection and/or the progress of programmes, in particular of washing machine programmes | [1994/06] | French: | Commande ou réglage de la sélection et/ou du déroulement de programmes, en particulier de programmes de lavage dans les machines à laver | [1994/06] | File destroyed: | 06.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 10.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/22] | 02.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4449384 (JONES WILLIAM H [US]) [A] 1,3,5,7 * column A; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2598443 (CANDY ELETTRODOMESTICI [IT]) [A] 1,3-5 * abstract *; | [A]DE3705010 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1,3,5 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE9106601U (BSH-SCHALTTECHNIK GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1-4,8-10 * the whole document *; | [E]EP0565926 (WHIRLPOOL EUROP [NL]) [E] 1,3-5,10* figure -; claim - * |