EP0635589 - Method and apparatus for regulating the fleece or band weight of the end product of a fibre processing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERGETH HOLLINGSWORTH GMBH Halterner Strasse 70 D-48249 Dülmen / DE | [1995/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heier, Thomas Südring 19 D-48249 Dülmen / DE | 02 /
Busch, Paul Merfelderstrasse 80 D-48249 Dülmen / DE | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1995/04] | Dallmeyer, Georg, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 93111651.1 | 21.07.1993 | [1995/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0635589 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | D01G23/04 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
D01G23/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/25] |
Former [1995/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Regelung des Flächen- bzw. Bandgewichts des Endproduktes einer faserverarbeitenden Maschine | [1995/04] | English: | Method and apparatus for regulating the fleece or band weight of the end product of a fibre processing machine | [1995/04] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le réglage du poids de la nappe ou de la mèche d'un produit final d'une machine travaillant des fibres | [1995/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1994 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, DK, ES, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL | 07.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/32] | 07.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/12] | 20.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.10.1994 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.10.1994 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.10.1994 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.10.1994 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.10.1994 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.10.1994 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.10.1994 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.10.1994 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.10.1994 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.10.1994 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.10.1994 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.10.1994 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.10.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0347715 (MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG) [Y] 1,2 * page 6, line 24 - page 10, line 3; figures 7-11; claim 1 *; | [Y]BE885372 (OCTIR S.P.A.) [Y] 1,2 * page 5 - page 12; figures 1,2,3,4 *; | [A]EP0253471 (JOHN D.HOLLINGSWORTH ON WHEELS INC.) [A] 1,2 * page 6, paragraph 4 - page 12, paragraph 3; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]JPH0434024 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920514), vol. 016, no. 202, Database accession no. (C - 0940), & JP04034024 A 19920205 (DAIWABO CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |