EP0582875 - Apparatus for parallel image generation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1994/07] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Tadashi 14-18, Asahigaoka 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga-ken 520 / JP | 02 /
Nishimura, Akio 1-7-15-209, Shinkanaoka-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu 591 / JP | 03 /
Wakayama, Yorihiko 5-1-404, Myokenzaka Katano-shi, Osaka-fu 576 / JP | 04 /
Maenobu, Kiyoshi 3-11-3, Konakajima Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken 661 / JP | 05 /
Segawa, Kazu 8-1-305, Suehiro-cho Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571 / JP | 06 /
Hirai, Makoto 2-21-17-502, Saitera Suita-shi, Osaka-fu 565 / JP | 07 /
Nishimura, Kenji Paruhaitsu 105, 1-88-67, Otorinishimachi Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu 593 / JP | 08 /
Naka, Toshiya, Gurinpia moriguchi B-220 1-77-1, Minamiterakata minamitori Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570 / JP | 09 /
Minehisa, Jiro 3-29-12, Baika, Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 554 / JP | 10 /
Abe, Minobu 15-43, Ikagasakaemachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka-fu 573 / JP | [1994/07] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/07] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 93111797.2 | 23.07.1993 | [1994/07] | Priority number, date | JP19920199391 | 27.07.1992 Original published format: JP 19939192 | JP19920251028 | 21.09.1992 Original published format: JP 25102892 | [1994/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0582875 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0582875 | Date: | 08.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0582875 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/10 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
G06T1/20 (EP,US);
G06T15/405 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/07] | G06F15/72 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/07] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur parallelen Bilderzeugung | [1994/07] | English: | Apparatus for parallel image generation | [1994/07] | French: | Dispositif de génération en parallèle d'images | [1994/07] | Examination procedure | 23.07.1993 | Examination requested [1994/07] | 10.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 07.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43] | Request for further processing for: | 05.04.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 05.04.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.05.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 31.10.2001 | [2003/08] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9209947 (VPL RESEARCH INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * abstract ** page 10, line 30 - page 12, line 5 * |