EP0581211 - Aqueous coating, process for its preparation and its use in processes for multilayer coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1997 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1997 [1997/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herberts Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | For all designated states Herberts Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Christbusch 25 D-42285 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Göbel, Armin Schürenerstrasse 14 D-44269 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
Patzschke, Hans-Peter, Dr. Am Heckendorn 71 D-42279 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
Doebert, Jürgen Gevelsbergerstrasse 149B D-45549 Wuppertal / DE | [1994/05] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 93111824.4 | 23.07.1993 | [1994/05] | Priority number, date | DE19924224617 | 25.07.1992 Original published format: DE 4224617 | [1994/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0581211 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0581211 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/08, C09D175/14 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
B05D7/53 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (EP,KR,US);
C09D151/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D151/08, C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
C09D175/04, C08L51/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/05] | Title | German: | Wässriges Überzugsmittel, Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung und dessen Verwendung bei Verfahren zur Mehrschichtlackierung | [1994/05] | English: | Aqueous coating, process for its preparation and its use in processes for multilayer coating | [1994/05] | French: | Composition de revêtement aqueux, procédé pour sa préparation et son utilisation pour la préparation d'un revêtement multicouche | [1994/05] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 27.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2310128 (REICHHOLD ALBERT CHEMIE AG); | [A]DE3805629 ; | [AD]GB2218426 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP], et al); | [XD]EP0379158 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0458243 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE4127680 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0480251 (BASF AG [DE]) |