EP0581259 - Image forming apparatus and light quantity control device for use in the image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakata, Shirou c/o CANON K.K., 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Otaka, Koichi c/o CANON K.K., 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Masako c/o CANON K.K., 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/51] |
Former [1994/05] | 01 /
Sakata, Shirou c/o CANON K.K., 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Otaka, Koichi c/o CANON K.K., 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Takashasi, Masako c/o CANON K.K., 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/05] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93112042.2 | 28.07.1993 | [1994/05] | Priority number, date | JP19920202526 | 29.07.1992 Original published format: JP 20252692 | JP19920202527 | 29.07.1992 Original published format: JP 20252792 | JP19920202542 | 29.07.1992 Original published format: JP 20254292 | [1994/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0581259 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0581259 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0581259 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06K15/12 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
G06K15/1214 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/05] | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsgerät und Vorrichtung für die Steuerung der Lichtmenge zur Verwendung in diesem Gerät | [1994/05] | English: | Image forming apparatus and light quantity control device for use in the image forming apparatus | [1994/05] | French: | Dispositif de formation d'image et circuit de commande de la quantité de lumière utilisé dans ce dispositif | [1994/05] | Examination procedure | 10.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 14.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 22.12.1999 | IT | 22.12.1999 | GB | 28.07.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 22.12.1999 | |
GB | 28.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/28] | FR | 19.05.2000 | |
GB | 28.07.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | FR | 19.05.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4727382 (NEGISHI KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,7,9 * column 1, line 67 - column 3, line 3; figures 1,6; claims 5,6,17 *; | [A]US4879459 (NEGISHI KIYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1,5-7,9 * column 1, line 47 - line 68; figure 1 *; | [A]US4912714 (HATANAKA KAZUOMI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5-7,9 * column 3, line 13 - line 59; claim 1 *; | [A]US4463364 (TAMURA YASUYUKI [JP]) [A] 1,6,7,9 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0358171 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,6,7,9 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * |