EP0594955 - Side panel for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.1997 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.1997 [1997/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 D-70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vogelgesang, Harald-Werner Hofstaetterstrasse 30 D-75449 Wurmberg / DE | [1994/18] | Application number, filing date | 93112245.1 | 30.07.1993 | [1994/18] | Priority number, date | DE19924232192 | 25.09.1992 Original published format: DE 4232192 | [1994/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0594955 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0594955 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0594955 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/04 | [1994/18] | CPC: |
B60R13/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/18] | Title | German: | Seitenverkleidung für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1994/18] | English: | Side panel for motor vehicles | [1994/18] | French: | Panneau latéral pour véhicules automobiles | [1994/18] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 25.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2136863 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,9 * page 1, line 82 - line 109; figures 2,3 * |