EP0590269 - Method and apparatus for packaging potted plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/14] | Article packaging system | ||
[1997/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOUTHPAC TRUST INTERNATIONAL, Inc., not individually, but as Trustee of the Family Trust Centrepoint, 2nd Floor Rarotonga / CK | [1997/44] |
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states SOUTHPAC TRUST INTERNATIONAL, Inc., not individually, but as trustee of the Family Trust U/T/A dated December 8, 1995 Centrepoint, 2nd Floor Raratonga / CK | ||
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states Highland Supply Corporation 1111 Sixth Street Highland, Illinois 62249 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Craig, Frank 90 Inez Valley Park Missouri 63088 / US | 02 /
Straeter, Joseph G. 3817 Praire Road Highland Illinois 62249 / US | 03 /
Weder, Donald E. 621 Main Street Highland Illinois 62249 / US | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/35] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/14] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93112294.9 | 30.07.1993 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | US19920954635 | 30.09.1992 Original published format: US 954635 | [1994/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0590269 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0590269 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65B25/02 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
B65B25/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von Topfpflanzen | [1997/44] | English: | Method and apparatus for packaging potted plants | [1997/44] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour emballer des plantes en pot | [1997/44] |
Former [1994/14] | Verpackungssystem für Artikel | ||
Former [1994/14] | Article packaging system | ||
Former [1994/14] | Système d'emballage pour objets | Examination procedure | 28.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/47] | 28.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 21.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/43] | Request for further processing for: | 21.08.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 21.08.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.09.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.10.1997 | BE | 29.10.1997 | CH | 29.10.1997 | DK | 29.10.1997 | ES | 29.10.1997 | GR | 29.10.1997 | IT | 29.10.1997 | LI | 29.10.1997 | PT | 29.01.1998 | SE | 29.01.1998 | DE | 30.01.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 29.10.1997 | |
BE | 29.10.1997 | ||
CH | 29.10.1997 | ||
DK | 29.10.1997 | ||
ES | 29.10.1997 | ||
GR | 29.10.1997 | ||
IT | 29.10.1997 | ||
LI | 29.10.1997 | ||
PT | 29.01.1998 | ||
SE | 29.01.1998 | ||
DE | 30.01.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 29.10.1997 | |
BE | 29.10.1997 | ||
CH | 29.10.1997 | ||
DK | 29.10.1997 | ||
GR | 29.10.1997 | ||
IT | 29.10.1997 | ||
LI | 29.10.1997 | ||
PT | 29.01.1998 | ||
SE | 29.01.1998 | ||
DE | 30.01.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 29.10.1997 | |
BE | 29.10.1997 | ||
CH | 29.10.1997 | ||
DK | 29.10.1997 | ||
IT | 29.10.1997 | ||
LI | 29.10.1997 | ||
PT | 29.01.1998 | ||
SE | 29.01.1998 | ||
DE | 30.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/46] | AT | 29.10.1997 | |
BE | 29.10.1997 | ||
CH | 29.10.1997 | ||
DK | 29.10.1997 | ||
LI | 29.10.1997 | ||
PT | 29.01.1998 | ||
SE | 29.01.1998 | ||
DE | 30.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/45] | AT | 29.10.1997 | |
CH | 29.10.1997 | ||
DK | 29.10.1997 | ||
LI | 29.10.1997 | ||
PT | 29.01.1998 | ||
SE | 29.01.1998 | ||
DE | 30.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/37] | AT | 29.10.1997 | |
DK | 29.10.1997 | ||
PT | 29.01.1998 | ||
SE | 29.01.1998 | ||
DE | 30.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 29.10.1997 | |
DK | 29.10.1997 | ||
SE | 29.01.1998 | ||
DE | 30.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/21] | SE | 29.01.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4365458 (PALMER LEONARD, et al); | [AD]US4773182 (WEDER DONALD E [US], et al); | [A]US5035105 (QVARNSTROEM BENGT G L [SE]) |