EP0591638 - Procedure for storage of picture and sound adjustments in television receivers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.1998 [1998/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRUNDIG Aktiengesellschaft Kurgartenstrasse 37 90762 Fürth / DE | [1997/20] |
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states Grundig E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig GmbH & Co. KG Kurgartenstrasse 37 90762 Fürth / DE | ||
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig GmbH & Co. KG Kurgartenstrasse 37 D-90762 Fürth / DE | ||
Former [1994/15] | For all designated states GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co. KG. D-90748 Fürth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosenberger, Winfried, GRUNDIG E.M.V. Max Grundig, holländ. Stiftung & Co KG D-90748 Fürth / DE | [1994/15] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1995/34] |
Former [1994/15] | Eichstädt, Alfred Grundig E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig holländ. Stiftung & Co. KG D-90748 Fürth / DE | Application number, filing date | 93112307.9 | 31.07.1993 | [1994/15] | Priority number, date | DE19924233900 | 08.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4233900 | [1994/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0591638 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0591638 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44, H03J1/00 | [1994/15] | CPC: |
H04N5/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Speicherung der Einstellwerte für die Bild- und Tonwiedergabe von Fernsehempfängern | [1994/15] | English: | Procedure for storage of picture and sound adjustments in television receivers | [1994/15] | French: | Procédé pour le stockage des données d'ajustement d'image et de son dans récepteurs de télévision | [1994/15] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/46] | 15.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0208199 (BLAUPUNKT WERKE GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0136060 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [AD]DE2804296 (INDESIT) |