EP0584585 - Process for the preparation of N-acylderivatives of the acid 5-aminolevulinic and their hydrochlorides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.1996 [1996/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Südzucker Aktiengesellschaft Mannheim/Ochsenfurt Maximilianstrasse 10 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | For all designated states SÜDZUCKER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT MANNHEIM/OCHSENFURT Maximilianstrasse 10 D-68165 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Descotes, Gérard 60, Rue Waldeck Rousseau F-69006 LYON / FR | 02 /
Cottier, Louis 4, Avenue Dr. Zamenhof F-69300 Caluire / FR | 03 /
Eymard, Laurent 5, Place de la Mairie F-26120 Malissard / FR | 04 /
Rapp, Knut M. Im Kerner 16 D-67591 OFFSTEIN / DE | [1994/09] | Representative(s) | Gleiss, Alf-Olav, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Gleiss, Alf-Olav, Dr.jur. Dipl.-Ing., et al Gleiss & Grosse Patentanwaltskanzlei Maybachstrasse 6A D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93112321.0 | 31.07.1993 | [1994/09] | Priority number, date | DE19924228084 | 24.08.1992 Original published format: DE 4228084 | [1994/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0584585 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C231/14, C07C233/47 | [1994/09] | CPC: |
C07D307/52 (EP,US);
C07C231/14 (EP,US);
C07C233/47 (EP,US);
C07D307/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von N-Acylderivaten der 5-Aminolävulinsäure sowie des Hydrochlorids der freien Säure | [1994/09] | English: | Process for the preparation of N-acylderivatives of the acid 5-aminolevulinic and their hydrochlorides | [1994/09] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation des N-acyldérivés de l'acide 5-aminolévulinigue et ses chlorhydrates | [1994/09] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/09] | 30.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/32] | 04.03.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1996/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH0372450 ; | [A]EP0483714 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) [A] 1-10 * claim - *; | JPH0276841 [ ] (OSAKA ORGANIC CHEM IND) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910612), vol. 015, no. 231, Database accession no. (C - 840), & JP03072450 A 19910327 (COSMO SOGO KENKYUSHO KK) [AD] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - SUZUKI K, "Preparation of aminolevulinic acid derivatives", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900924), vol. 113, no. 13, Database accession no. 114653 [A] 1-10 * abstract * |