EP0584595 - Signal processing method and displacement detection apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eguchi, Tadashi, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | [1994/09] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93112485.3 | 04.08.1993 | [1994/09] | Priority number, date | JP19920231291 | 06.08.1992 Original published format: JP 23129192 | JP19930197981 | 15.07.1993 Original published format: JP 19798193 | [1994/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0584595 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0584595 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/244, H03M1/00 | [1994/09] | CPC: |
H03M1/203 (EP,US);
G01D5/24404 (EP,US);
H03M1/303 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/09] | Title | German: | Signalverarbeitungsverfahren und Versatzerfassungsvorrichtung | [1997/45] | English: | Signal processing method and displacement detection apparatus | [1994/09] | French: | Méthode de traitement des signaux et capteur de déplacement | [1994/09] |
Former [1994/09] | Signalverarbeitungsmethode und Wegmessvorrichtung | Examination procedure | 19.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 29.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.1998
ADMISSIBLE DR. JOHANNES HEIDENHAIN GmbH Postfach 1260 83292 Traunreut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.1998
ADMISSIBLE DR. JOHANNES HEIDENHAIN GmbH Postfach 1260 D-83292 Traunreut / DE | 14.09.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.01.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.01.1999 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1999 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 17.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 28.04.2003 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 05.11.1997 | IT | 05.11.1997 | NL | 05.11.1997 | GB | 04.08.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/08] | IT | 05.11.1997 | |
NL | 05.11.1997 | ||
FR | 03.04.1998 | ||
GB | 04.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 05.11.1997 | |
FR | 03.04.1998 | ||
GB | 04.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/30] | FR | 03.04.1998 | |
GB | 04.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | FR | 03.04.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU1283807 ; | [Y]DE3106429 (ANILAM ELECTRONIC HANS PETER B [DE]) [Y] 1-13* abstract *; | [X]EP0298183 (RSF ELEKTRONIK GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0463561 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 35, Database accession no. 87-248654, & SU1283807 A 00000000 (KUZMINSKI) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-13 * abstract * |