EP0582970 - Additive for desulfurization of liquid pig and cast iron and process for desulfurizing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freissmuth, Alfred, Dr.-Ing. Alpenblick 7 D-83355 Grabenstätt / DE | [1994/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freissmuth, Alfred, Dr. Alpenblick 7 D-83355 Grabenstätt / DE | 02 /
Wieser, Eugen Ing. Rif, Am Spitz 17 A-5400 Hallein / AT | [1994/07] | Application number, filing date | 93112545.4 | 05.08.1993 | [1994/07] | Priority number, date | DE19924226833 | 13.08.1992 Original published format: DE 4226833 | [1994/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0582970 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0582970 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C21C1/02 | [1994/07] | CPC: |
C21C1/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/07] | Title | German: | Entschwefelungsmittel für Roheisen- und Gusseisenschmelzen sowie Verfahren zur Entschwefelung | [1994/07] | English: | Additive for desulfurization of liquid pig and cast iron and process for desulfurizing | [1994/07] | French: | Produit pour désulfuration des fontes et des aciers liquides et procédé de désulfuration | [1994/07] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/18] | 06.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 08.04.1998 | FR | 08.04.1998 | IT | 08.04.1998 | NL | 08.04.1998 | SE | 08.07.1998 | AT | 05.08.1998 | BE | 31.08.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 08.04.1998 | |
FR | 08.04.1998 | ||
IT | 08.04.1998 | ||
NL | 08.04.1998 | ||
SE | 08.07.1998 | ||
AT | 05.08.1998 | ||
BE | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 08.04.1998 | |
IT | 08.04.1998 | ||
NL | 08.04.1998 | ||
SE | 08.07.1998 | ||
AT | 05.08.1998 | ||
BE | 31.08.1998 | ||
FR | 04.09.1998 | ||
Former [2002/25] | ES | 08.04.1998 | |
IT | 08.04.1998 | ||
SE | 08.07.1998 | ||
AT | 05.08.1998 | ||
BE | 31.08.1998 | ||
FR | 04.09.1998 | ||
Former [2000/24] | IT | 08.04.1998 | |
SE | 08.07.1998 | ||
AT | 05.08.1998 | ||
BE | 31.08.1998 | ||
FR | 04.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 08.04.1998 | |
SE | 08.07.1998 | ||
BE | 31.08.1998 | ||
FR | 04.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | SE | 08.07.1998 | |
BE | 31.08.1998 | ||
FR | 04.09.1998 | ||
Former [1998/52] | SE | 08.07.1998 | |
FR | 04.09.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | SE | 08.07.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU500236 ; | [A]GB1415150 (MAGNESIUM ELEKTRON LTD); | [A]DE2650113 (JONES & LAUGHLIN STEEL CORP); | [A]DE3000927 (FOSECO INT [GB]); | [A]EP0066305 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0225560 (CRESPI GIOVANNI); | [A]EP0292205 (FOSECO INT [GB]); | [AD]DE3831831 ; | [Y]EP0360223 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KALKSTICKSTOFF [DE]) | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED Section Ch, Week 7717, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M24, AN 77-30309Y & SU-A-500 236 (MOSIASHVILI V V) 1977, & SU500236 A 00000000 |