EP0589223 - Electronic module with a Boundary-Scan architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.1999 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/07] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bode, Hans-Jörgen Dipl.-Ing Rablstrasse 46 D-81669 München / DE | 02 /
Lüders, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys. Färbergasse 1 D-85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | [1994/13] | Application number, filing date | 93113525.5 | 24.08.1993 | [1994/13] | Priority number, date | DE19924232271 | 25.09.1992 Original published format: DE 4232271 | [1994/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0589223 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0589223 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0589223 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/3177, G06F11/00, G06F11/26 | [1998/38] | CPC: |
G01R31/318561 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/03] | G01R31/318, G06F11/00, G06F11/26 | ||
Former IPC [1994/13] | G01R31/318 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [1994/13] | Title | German: | Elektronischer Baustein mit einer Schieberegisterprüfarchitektur (Boundary-Scan) | [1994/13] | English: | Electronic module with a Boundary-Scan architecture | [1994/13] | French: | Module électronique à architecture Boundary-Scan | [1994/13] | Examination procedure | 21.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/20] | 30.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 17.02.1999 | IE | 19.10.1999 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/10] | IE | 19.10.1999 | |
Former [2000/27] | IE | 17.02.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5015875 (GILES GRADY L [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 2, line 56 - column 5, line 20; figures 1-2 *; | [A]EP0430844 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-3* column 3, line 6 - column 5, line 7; figures 1-3 *; | [Y] - "component identification data retrieval via serial interface", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, NEW YORK, US, (198912), no. 308, page 954, XP000096126 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * | [Y] - "electronic serial number identification technique", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (198005), vol. 22, no. 12, page 5411 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * | [DA] - MAIERHOFER, "Der "JTAG Boundary-Scan"", ELEKTRONIK, MüNCHEN DE, (19890428), vol. 38, no. 9, pages 108 - 113, XP000037010 [DA] 1-4 * page 10, column 2, line 4 - line 23; figure 2 * * page 110, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, line 8; figure 3 * |