EP0590322 - Support for an image-receiving material for thermal dye diffusion transfer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.1998 [1998/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Felix Schoeller jr. Papierfabrik GmbH & Co. KG Burg Gretesch D-49086 Osnabrück / DE | [1994/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graumann, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Hammerweg 10 D-49090 Osnabrück / DE | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Minderop, Ralph H., et al Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/17] | Minderop, Ralph H., Dr. rer. nat., et al Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1994/50] | Rücker, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1994/14] | Rücker, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Bergiusstrasse 2 b D-30655 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 93113782.2 | 28.08.1993 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | DE19924233018 | 01.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4233018 | [1994/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0590322 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0590322 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0590322 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
B41M5/44 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24893 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249987 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/273 (EP,US);
Y10T428/277 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31902 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/14] | Title | German: | Trägermaterial für ein Bildempfangsmaterial für thermische Farbstoffdiffusionsübertragung | [1994/14] | English: | Support for an image-receiving material for thermal dye diffusion transfer | [1994/14] | French: | Support pour un matériau récepteur d'images pour transfert thermique de colorants par diffusion | [1994/14] | Examination procedure | 21.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/33] | 05.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5106818 (ASHIDA TETSUYA [JP]) [X] 1-10 * column 2, lines 66-68; claims 1-8 * * column 4, lines 58-68 * | by applicant | JPS62146693 | US5106818 | JPH0392382 | JPH03110195 | DE3934014 |