EP0589239 - Styrene-butadiene rubber for truck tires [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rodgers, Michael Brendan 3261 Morewood Road Akron, Ohio 44333 / US | 02 /
Halasa, Adel Farhan 5040 Everett Road Bath, Ohio 44210 / US | 03 /
Hsu, Wen-Liang 4482 Conestoga Trail Copley, Ohio 44321 / US | 04 /
Matrana, Barry Allen 1639 Liberty Drive Akron, Ohio 44313 / US | 05 /
Mezynski, Stanley Michael 408 Valley Crest Drive Mogadore, Ohio 44260 / US | [1996/41] |
Former [1994/13] | 01 /
Rodgers, Michael Brendan 3261 Morewood Road Akron, Ohio 44333 / US | ||
02 /
Halasa, Adel Farhan 5040 Everett Road Bath, Ohio 44210 / US | |||
03 /
Hsu, Wen-Liang (nmn) 4482 Conestoga Trail Copley, Ohio 44321 / US | |||
04 /
Matrana, Barry Allen 1639 Liberty Drive Akron, Ohio 44313 / US | |||
05 /
Mezynski, Stanley Michael 408 Valley Crest Drive Mogadore, Ohio 44260 / US | Representative(s) | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg Patent-Department L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [1994/13] | Application number, filing date | 93113785.5 | 28.08.1993 | [1994/13] | Priority number, date | US19920944573 | 14.09.1992 Original published format: US 944573 | [1994/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0589239 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0589239 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08L9/06, C08F236/10, B60C1/00 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
C08F236/10 (EP,US);
B60C1/0016 (EP,US);
C08L7/00 (EP,US);
C08L9/06 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10495 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1386 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31826 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F236/10, C08F4/48 (EP,US);
C08L7/00, C08L2666/08 (US,EP);
C08L9/06, C08L2666/08 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL [1994/13] | Title | German: | Styrol-Butadien-Kautschuk für LKW-Luftreifen | [1996/41] | English: | Styrene-butadiene rubber for truck tires | [1994/13] | French: | Caoutchouc styrène-butadiène pour pneumatiques de camions | [1996/41] |
Former [1994/13] | Butadin-Styrol-Kautschuk für LKW-Luftreifen | ||
Former [1994/13] | Caoutchouc butadiène-styrène pour pneumatiques de camions | Examination procedure | 28.08.1993 | Examination requested [1994/13] | 21.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0054911 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1,7 * page 1, line 1 - line 6 * * page 8, line 8 and page 9, line 1 * * page 10, line 20 - line 24 *; | JPS61255917 [ ] (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1987), vol. 106, no. 22, Database accession no. 177935s [A] 1,7 * abstract * |