EP0600164 - Method for the improvement of transmission properties of an electro-acoustic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.12.1999 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | For all designated states Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 D-70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walker, Michael Ringstrasse 35 D-73666 Baltmannsweiler / DE | 02 /
Heitkämper, Peter Kirchplatz 3 D-64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE | [1994/23] | Representative(s) | Knecht, Ulrich Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Knecht, Ulrich Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/23] | Knecht, Ulrich Karl, et al Alcatel SEL AG, Patent- und Lizenzwesen, Postfach 30 09 29 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93113875.4 | 31.08.1993 | [1994/23] | Priority number, date | DE19924229912 | 08.09.1992 Original published format: DE 4229912 | [1994/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0600164 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04R3/02 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
H04B1/64 (EP);
H04M9/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verbessern der Übertragungseigenschaften einer elektroakustischen Anlage | [1999/09] | English: | Method for the improvement of transmission properties of an electro-acoustic device | [1994/23] | French: | Procédé pour l'amélioration de la qualité de transmission d'un dispositif électro-acoustique | [1994/23] |
Former [1994/23] | Verfahren zum Verbessern der Übertragungseingenschaften einer elektroakustischen Anlage | Examination procedure | 21.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 17.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/04] | 12.09.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3822353 ; | [A]EP0467499 ; | [A]EP0280907 |