EP0585869 - Solid titanium catalyst component for olefin polymerization, process for preparing the same, catalyst for olefin polymerization and process for olefin polymerization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.1998 [1998/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toida, Tetsuya, c/o Mitsui Petro. Ind., Ltd. 1-2, Waki 6-chome, Waki-cho Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi 740 / JP | 02 /
Shinozaki, Tetsunori, c/o Mitsui Petro. Ind., Ltd. 1-2, Waki 6-chome, Waki-cho Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi 740 / JP | 03 /
Kioka, Mamoru, c/o Mitsui Petro. Ind., Ltd. 1-2, Waki 6-chome, Waki-cho Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi 740 / JP | [1994/10] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93113892.9 | 31.08.1993 | [1994/10] | Priority number, date | JP19920231732 | 31.08.1992 Original published format: JP 23173292 | JP19930075513 | 01.04.1993 Original published format: JP 7551393 | JP19930206345 | 20.08.1993 Original published format: JP 20634593 | [1994/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0585869 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0585869 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F4/651, C08F4/654 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F4/654 (KR);
C08F10/06 (EP,US);
C08F110/06 (EP,US);
Y10S526/904 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/651 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/6543 (EP,US);
C08F10/06, C08F4/651 (US,EP);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/18, C08F2500/15 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/10] | Title | German: | Festes Titan enthaltendes Katalysatorbestandteil für Olefinpolymerisation, Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben, Katalysator für Olefinpolymerisation und Verfahren zur Olefinpolymerisation | [1994/10] | English: | Solid titanium catalyst component for olefin polymerization, process for preparing the same, catalyst for olefin polymerization and process for olefin polymerization | [1994/10] | French: | Composant catalytique à base de titanium pour polymérisation d'oléfines, procédé pour le préparer, catalyseur pour polymérisation et procédé de polymérisation d'oléfines | [1994/10] | Examination procedure | 08.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 17.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04218507 ; | [A]EP0361494 (HIMONT INC [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 ** examples 1,3 *; | [A]EP0437264 (HIMONT INC [US]) [A] 1; | [A]EP0452156 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1,5-11 * claims 5,7 * * examples 20,21 *; | [PX]EP0506074 (HIMONT INC [US]) [PX] 1 * examples 6,12 *; | [PX] - EERO IISKOLA, "A novel MgCl2-supported Ziegler-Natta catalyst composition: stereospecific polymerization of propene without external donor", MAKROMOL. CHEM. RAPID COMMUN., BASEL, (199302), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 133 - 137, XP000334499 [PX] 1,5-7,9-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/marc.1993.030140212 | [X] - "Catalyst system for polymerizing olefin", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 92-312538, & JPH04218507 A 19920810 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES) [X] 2,3 * abstract * |