EP0577156 - Composite nonwoven web material and method of formation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2001 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | ||
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Radwanski, Fred R. 4310 Mary Court Norcross, Georgia 30092 / US | 02 /
Chambers, Leon E., Jr. 770 Brannon Oaks Lane Cumming Georgia 30131 / US | 03 /
Trimble, Lloyd E. Route 2, Box 33A Dustin, Oklahoma 74839 / US | [1994/15] |
Former [1994/01] | 01 /
Radwanski, Fred R. 4310 Mary Court Norcross, Georgia 30092 / US | ||
02 /
Chambers, Leon E., Jr. 245 Mill Creek Place Roswell, Georgia 30076 / US | |||
03 /
Trimble, Lloyd E. Route 2, Box 33A Dustin, Oklahoma 74839 / US | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/51] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 80603 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/01] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93114080.0 | 17.03.1989 | [1994/01] | Priority number, date | US19880170200 | 18.03.1988 Original published format: US 170200 | [1994/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0577156 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0577156 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0577156 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | D04H13/00, D04H1/44, D04H1/56 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
D04H5/02 (EP,US);
D04H1/44 (KR);
D04H1/425 (EP,US);
D04H1/492 (EP,US);
D04H1/495 (EP,US);
D04H1/498 (EP,US);
D04H1/56 (EP,KR,US);
D04H3/14 (EP,US);
D04H5/03 (EP,US);
Y10S428/903 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24091 (EP,US);
Y10T442/626 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1994/01] | D04H13/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/01] | Title | German: | Verbundvliesstoffmaterial und sein Herstellverfahren | [1994/01] | English: | Composite nonwoven web material and method of formation thereof | [1994/01] | French: | Matériau en voile de non-tissé laminé et méthode de sa realisation | [1994/01] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1993 | Examination requested [1994/01] | 22.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89104801.9 / EP0333211 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.11.2000 | SE | 18.03.2001 | ES | 19.03.2001 | [2004/38] |
Former [2002/05] | BE | 02.11.2000 | |
SE | 18.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/02] | BE | 02.11.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2731291 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [A] 1-5,10-14,17-22,28-33 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0062259 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1,17 * abstract * * page 1, line 19 - line 24 * * page 2, line 17 - line 36 * * page 3, lines 1-16 * * page 4, lines 1-15 * [A] 2-14,18-22,27-33; | [A]GB2114054 (UNI CHARM CORP) [A] 1,17,19,35 * abstract * * page 1, lines 30-56; claims 1-3,5 *; | [XA]EP0092819 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [X] 1,17 * abstract * [A] 2-14,17-22,27-33; | [A]EP0108621 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 3-10,21,23,31-33 * abstract *; | [A]EP0252743 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL [US]) [A] 1,15,33* abstract * |