EP0589278 - Radio mobile network with hierarchical cell structures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ivanov, Kolio, Dr. Johann-Clanze-Strasse 43 D-81369 München / DE | 02 /
Schulz, Egon, Dr. Wittenberger Strasse 3 D-80993 München / DE | [1994/13] | Application number, filing date | 93114350.7 | 07.09.1993 | [1994/13] | Priority number, date | DE19924231859 | 23.09.1992 Original published format: DE 4231859 | [1994/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0589278 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0589278 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0589278 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/20, H04B7/26 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
H04W36/04 (EP,US);
H04W36/324 (EP,US);
H04W16/32 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/13] | H04Q7/04, H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/13] | Title | German: | Mobiles Funknetz mit hierarchischen Zellstrukturen | [1999/11] | English: | Radio mobile network with hierarchical cell structures | [1994/13] | French: | Réseau radio mobile avec structure hiérarchique des cellules | [1994/13] |
Former [1994/13] | Mobiles Funknetz mit hierarchische Zellstrukturen | Examination procedure | 19.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/42] | 08.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 07.09.2000 | [2007/29] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0369535 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al); | [X]GB2242806 (STC PLC [GB]); | [E]EP0562743 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) |