EP0590374 - Process for preparation of hydroxyapatite [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1996 [1996/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BK LADENBURG GmbH, Gesellschaft für chemische Erzeugnisse Dr.-Albert-Reimann-Strasse 2 D-68526 Ladenburg / DE | [1994/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maurer, Alexander Dr. Kochelseeweg 1 D-68219 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Raab, Gudrun Lortzingstrasse 1 D-69514 Laudenbach / DE | 03 /
Raab, Günter Lortzingstrasse 1 D-69514 Laudenbach / DE | 04 /
Schmitt, Reinhold Am Brunnacker 4 D-69469 Weinheim / DE | 05 /
Schober, Detlev Eppsteinerstrasse 33 D-67227 Frankenthal / DE | 06 /
Tänzler, Richard, Dr. Herdichsgartenstrasse 30 D-69514 Laudenbach / DE | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Grussdorf, Jürgen, et al Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | Grussdorf, Jürgen, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 93114455.4 | 09.09.1993 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | DE19924232443 | 28.09.1992 Original published format: DE 4232443 | [1994/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0590374 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0590374 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C01B25/32, A61K7/16 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
D06P3/54 (EP,US);
A61K8/24 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
C01B25/322 (EP,US);
D06P1/6491 (EP,US);
D06P3/523 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1994/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hydroxylapatit | [1994/14] | English: | Process for preparation of hydroxyapatite | [1994/14] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'hydroxyapatite | [1994/14] | Examination procedure | 09.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 22.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4274879 (IRVINE GEORGE D) [DA] 1 * claim 1 *; | [DA]US4324772 (CONN JAMES F, et al); | [DA]US4849193 (PALMER JAY W [US], et al) |