EP0591701 - Control device for electrical users, like signal lights, head lights, windscreen wipers, or the like, in a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.1998 [1998/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/15] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weigold, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Alte Landstrasse 2 D-76534 Baden-Baden / DE | [1994/15] | Application number, filing date | 93114549.4 | 10.09.1993 | [1994/15] | Priority number, date | DE19924233865 | 08.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4233865 | [1994/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0591701 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0591701 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0591701 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02 | [1994/15] | CPC: |
B60Q1/1476 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/15] | Title | German: | Bedienvorrichtung für elektrische Verbraucher, wie Blinker, Scheinwerfer, Scheibenwischer od. dgl. in einem Fahrzeug | [1994/15] | English: | Control device for electrical users, like signal lights, head lights, windscreen wipers, or the like, in a vehicle | [1994/15] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour consommateurs électiques, comme clignoteurs, phares, essuie-glaces, ou similaire dans un véhicule | [1994/15] | Examination procedure | 03.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/14] | 15.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2110891 (LUCAS IND PLC) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 17 * * page 2, line 106 - line 118 * * page 3, line 10 - line 26; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4045667 (HANSON RICHARD J) [Y] 1-8 * column W *; | [Y]EP0376056 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-8 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 3 * * page 3, line 48 - line 56 * * page 4, line 10 - page 8, line 15; figures 1-3 * | [X] - JOHNSON ET AL., "SYSTEMS CONSIDERATIONS FOR INCORPORATING VEHICLE DATA NETWORKS INTO AUTOMOBILES", I MECH E, USA, (1985), pages 209 - 217 [X] 1-8 * page 209, column 1, line 1 - page 211, column 1, line 31 * * page 212, column 1, line 2 - page 213, column 2, line 19; figure 2 * | [XY] - SCHWAIGER ET AL., "DIE VIELFALT DER DATEN BÜNDELN", AUTOMOBILELEKTRONIK, MÜNCHEN, DE, (19890818), vol. 38, no. 17, pages 93 - 96, XP000048711 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 5-8 | [Y] - FLOYD, "A MICROPROCESSOR - BASED SERIAL MULTIPLEX SYSTEM IS COMBINED WITH SIMPLE MOMENTARY SWITCHES TO PROVIDE ERGONOMICALLY IMPROVED DRIVER INPUT CONTROLS FOR TRADITIONAL BODY ELECTRICAL FUNTIONS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, NEW YORK , USA, (198511), vol. 32, no. 4, pages 334 - 338, XP011178796 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * |