EP0588312 - Boiler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.1997 [1997/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A. SCHWARZ + CO. Innsbrucker Strasse 195 A-6100 Seefeld / AT | [1994/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stöckl, Alois Ulrichweg 10 A-6176 Völs / AT | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Torggler, Paul, et al Patentanwälte Torggler und Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 Postfach 556 6021 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | Torggler, Paul, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Paul Torggler Dr. Engelbert Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 93114811.8 | 15.09.1993 | [1994/12] | Priority number, date | AT19920001833 | 15.09.1992 Original published format: AT 183392 | [1994/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0588312 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0588312 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/28 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
F24H1/287 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1994/12] | Title | German: | Heizkessel | [1994/12] | English: | Boiler | [1994/12] | French: | Chaudière | [1994/12] | Examination procedure | 22.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/42] | 19.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2617390 (SCHUEDER GEORGE M, et al) [A] 1,4* figures 1,8 *; | [A]US3259107 (DAVID DALIN) [A] 1,2 * claim 5 *; | [A]DE1454507 (TRIANCO LTD) [A] 1,3 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE3618979 (NOVA APPARATE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * figures 5,6 * | [A] - "WOOD-FUELED BOILER UNIT", N.T.I.S. TECH NOTES, SPRINGFIELD, (198403) [A] 1 |