EP0588315 - Exhaust gas purification apparatus for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.11.1998 [1998/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho, Kariya-City Aichi-pref., 448 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-City Aichi-Pref. 448 / JP | ||
Former [1994/12] | For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Hiroshi 3-3, Noguchi-1-chome Ichinomiya-shi / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Masakazu Abanraifu Sakae 501, 62, Sakaemachi-4-chome Okazaki-shi / JP | 03 /
Mabuchi, Mamoru Seifuryo, 33-1, Tennocho-5-chome Kariya-shi / JP | 04 /
Saito, Makoto 59, Fudagi Etakecho Nishio-shi / JP | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93114835.7 | 15.09.1993 | [1994/12] | Priority number, date | JP19920246903 | 16.09.1992 Original published format: JP 24690392 | JP19930040501 | 04.02.1993 Original published format: JP 4050193 | JP19930061036 | 25.02.1993 Original published format: JP 6103693 | [1994/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0588315 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0588315 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
B01D53/9445 (EP,US);
B01D53/9481 (EP,US);
F01N3/0814 (EP,US);
F01N3/0835 (EP,US);
F01N3/0878 (EP,US);
F01N3/2892 (EP,US);
F01N2240/02 (EP,US);
F01N2240/10 (EP,US);
F01N2250/12 (EP,US);
F01N2410/12 (EP,US);
F01N3/20 (EP,US);
F01N3/2842 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/12] | Title | German: | Abgasreinigungsvorrichtung für einen Verbrennungsmotor | [1994/12] | English: | Exhaust gas purification apparatus for internal combustion engine | [1994/12] | French: | Dispositif de purification des gaz d'échappement pour moteur à combustion interne | [1994/12] | Examination procedure | 04.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/35] | 21.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.1995 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3645098 (TEMPLIN ROBERT J, et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 72 - column 4, line 19; figures 1-5 * [A] 2,3,6,7; | [XA]EP0460542 (CORNING INC [US]) [X] 1 * column 13, line 14 - column 15, line 52; figure 1 * [A] 2,3; | [XA]JPH03194113 ; | [XPAP]JPH04311618 ; | [XA]US5142864 (DUNNE STEPHEN [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 53; figure . * [A] 2; | [XA]JPS62162715 ; | [XA]JPS62191609 ; | [XA]US3699683 (TOURTELLOTTE JOHN F, et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 38 - column 7, line 4; figures 1,2 * [A] 3; | [A]DE4113293 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911120), vol. 15, no. 457, Database accession no. (M - 1181), & JP03194113 A 19910823 (MAZDA) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,4 | [XPA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930319), vol. 17, no. 133, Database accession no. (M - 1383), & JP04311618 A 19921104 (NISSAN) [XP] 1 * abstract * [AP] 2 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871225), vol. 11, no. 397, Database accession no. (M - 655), & JP62162715 A 19870718 (TOYOTA) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 3 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880205), vol. 12, no. 39, Database accession no. (M - 665), & JP62191609 A 19870822 (TOYOTA) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 3 | Examination | EP0422432 |