EP0609492 - Holder plate for the partial heat treatment of articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ipsen International GmbH Flutstrasse 78 47533 Kleve / DE | [1997/19] |
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states IPSEN INDUSTRIES INTERNATIONAL GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRÄNKTER HAFTUNG Flutstrasse 78 D-47533 Kleve / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peter, Wolfgang Jan-de-Beyer-Strasse 15 D-46446 Emmerich / DE | [1994/32] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 93114885.2 | 16.09.1993 | [1994/32] | Priority number, date | DE19930001293U | 30.01.1993 Original published format: DE 9301293 U | [1994/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0609492 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0609492 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/22, F27D5/00, C21D9/00 | [1994/32] | CPC: |
C21D9/22 (EP,US);
C21D9/0025 (EP,US);
F27D5/005 (EP,US);
C21D2221/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/32] | Title | German: | Halterung zur partiellen Wärmebehandlung von Werkzeugen | [1994/32] | English: | Holder plate for the partial heat treatment of articles | [1994/32] | French: | Support pour le traitement thermique partiel d'articles | [1994/32] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 05.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 26.08.1998 | FR | 26.08.1998 | GB | 26.08.1998 | IT | 26.08.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/35] | ES | 26.08.1998 | |
FR | 26.08.1998 | ||
GB | 26.08.1998 | ||
Former [2002/25] | ES | 26.08.1998 | |
GB | 26.08.1998 | ||
FR | 22.01.1999 | ||
Former [1999/36] | GB | 26.08.1998 | |
FR | 22.01.1999 | ||
Former [1999/30] | GB | 26.08.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US3558113 (STROHMEIER GEROLF, et al) [Y] 1 * figure -; claim - * [A] 2-8; | [A]GB1471430 (KORTVELYESSY L) [A] 1-8 *The whole document*; | [A]GB2095383 (IPSEN IND INT GMBH); | [YA]EP0422353 (IPSEN IND INT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 6, line 30 - line 45; figure -; claim - * [A] 4,15; | [D]DE3934103 (IPSEN IND INT GMBH [DE]) |