EP0591775 - Method for preventing corrosion of a reinforced concrete structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai Nippon Toryo Co., Ltd. 6-1-124, Nishikujo Konohana-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | For all designated states Dai Nippon Toryo Co., Ltd. 6-1-124, Nishikujo Konohana-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furuya, Akio 4-12-7, Nishishiba, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Tsuji, Toshimoto 2-48-15, Takafunedai, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Sato, Takayuki 3-7-14, Tarumachi, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1994/15] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93115369.6 | 23.09.1993 | [1994/15] | Priority number, date | JP19920268818 | 07.10.1992 Original published format: JP 26881892 | [1994/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0591775 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0591775 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C23F13/00, C23F13/16 | [1994/15] | CPC: |
C23F13/16 (EP);
C23F13/02 (EP);
C23F2201/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Korrosionsverhinderung einer armierten Betonstruktur | [1994/15] | English: | Method for preventing corrosion of a reinforced concrete structure | [1994/15] | French: | Méthode pour empêcher la corrosion d'une structure en béton armé | [1994/15] | Examination procedure | 25.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/30] | 14.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4931156 ; | [A]DE3826926 ; | [AP]US5225058 |