EP0590585 - Sheet supplying apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyauchi, Yasuo, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93115613.7 | 28.09.1993 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | JP19920260267 | 29.09.1992 Original published format: JP 26026792 | JP19920357716 | 25.12.1992 Original published format: JP 35771692 | [1994/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0590585 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0590585 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0590585 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B41J13/00 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
B41J13/103 (EP,US);
B41J29/13 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/14] | Title | German: | Apparat zur Papierversorgung | [1994/14] | English: | Sheet supplying apparatus | [1994/14] | French: | Appareil pour l'alimentation en papier | [1994/14] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/13] | 15.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.06.1999 | BE | 02.06.1999 | CH | 02.06.1999 | ES | 02.06.1999 | FR | 02.06.1999 | GR | 02.06.1999 | LI | 02.06.1999 | NL | 02.06.1999 | SE | 02.06.1999 | DK | 02.09.1999 | PT | 02.09.1999 | IE | 28.09.1999 | LU | 28.09.1999 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
ES | 02.06.1999 | ||
GR | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
NL | 02.06.1999 | ||
SE | 02.06.1999 | ||
DK | 02.09.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
IE | 28.09.1999 | ||
LU | 28.09.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
ES | 02.06.1999 | ||
GR | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
NL | 02.06.1999 | ||
SE | 02.06.1999 | ||
DK | 02.09.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
IE | 28.09.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
ES | 02.06.1999 | ||
GR | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
NL | 02.06.1999 | ||
SE | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
IE | 28.09.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
ES | 02.06.1999 | ||
GR | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
SE | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
IE | 28.09.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
GR | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
SE | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
IE | 28.09.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
GR | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
IE | 28.09.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
IE | 28.09.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
CH | 07.09.1999 | ||
LI | 07.09.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
FR | 29.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | BE | 02.06.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9013433 (SIEMENS AG [DE])[A] 1-23 |