EP0590674 - Method for powering a muscle-operated vehicle and vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken 438 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken, 438 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takata, Nozomu 4-12-13, Fujimi-cho Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken 438 / JP | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93115844.8 | 30.09.1993 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | JP19920285432 | 30.09.1992 Original published format: JP 28543292 | [1994/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0590674 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0590674 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B62M23/02 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
B62M6/45 (EP,US);
B60L15/20 (EP,US);
B60L50/20 (EP,US);
B60L50/52 (EP,US);
B60L50/66 (EP,US);
B62M6/55 (EP,US);
B60L2200/12 (EP,US);
B60L2240/12 (EP,US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,US);
B60L2250/26 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1994/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betrieb eines muskelkraftbetriebenen Fahrzeugs und Fahrzeug | [1994/14] | English: | Method for powering a muscle-operated vehicle and vehicle | [1994/14] | French: | Méthode de propulsion d'un véhicule par la force musculaire et véhicule | [1994/14] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1998/02: (deleted) | EPB 1998/02: (deleted) | EPB 1998/02: (deleted) | EPB 1997/37: Teilanmeldung 97110154.8 eingereicht am 20/06/97 | EPB 1997/37: Divisional application 97110154.8 filed on 20/06/97 | EPB 1997/37: Demande divisionnaire 97110154.8 déposée le 20/06/97 | Examination procedure | 05.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 16.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 26.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97110154.8 / EP0798205 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01314685 ; | [A]EP0222179 (BINDER AVIAT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [PDA]EP0559231 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [PDA] 1,7* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900302), vol. 14, no. 113, Database accession no. (M - 0944), & JP01314685 A 19891219 (JAPAN II M KK) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | Examination | EP0569954 |