EP0591865 - A faulty weft separating apparatus in a rapier loom for multiple colors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TSUDAKOMA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | For all designated states TSUDAKOMA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oda, Kiyoyasu, c/o TSUDAKOMA KOGYO K.K. 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Akihiko, c/o TSUDAKOMA KOGYO K.K. 18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa-ken / JP | [1994/15] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93115906.5 | 01.10.1993 | [1994/15] | Priority number, date | JP19920264952 | 02.10.1992 Original published format: JP 26495292 | [1994/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0591865 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0591865 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | D03D51/08 | [1994/15] | CPC: |
D03D51/085 (EP,KR,US);
D03J1/04 (KR);
D03J2700/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/15] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Trennen eines fehlerhaften Schussfadens in einer mehrfarbigen Greiferwebmaschine | [1994/15] | English: | A faulty weft separating apparatus in a rapier loom for multiple colors | [1994/15] | French: | Dispositif pour séparer un fil de trame cassé dans un métier à griffes à couleurs multiples | [1994/15] | Examination procedure | 24.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/29] | 03.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 05.02.1997 | FR | 05.02.1997 | LI | 05.02.1997 | DE | 06.05.1997 | GB | 01.10.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [1998/41] | CH | 05.02.1997 | |
LI | 05.02.1997 | ||
DE | 06.05.1997 | ||
FR | 04.07.1997 | ||
GB | 01.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | CH | 05.02.1997 | |
LI | 05.02.1997 | ||
DE | 06.05.1997 | ||
FR | 04.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | DE | 06.05.1997 | |
FR | 04.07.1997 | ||
Former [1997/43] | DE | 06.05.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4858656 (SUWA MITSURU [JP]); | [A]EP0332257 (PICANOL NV [BE]); | [A]EP0446150 (SAURER DIEDERICHS SA [FR]) |