EP0591871 - A method and apparatus for the diagnostic testing of electrical equipment of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IVECO FIAT S.p.A. Via Puglia 35 10156 Torino / IT | [1999/19] |
Former [1994/15] | For all designated states IVECO FIAT S.p.A. Via Puglia 35 I-10156 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Varalda, Orlando Via delle Pervinche 53/B 10151 Torino / IT | 02 /
Magrini, Maurizio Via Aquileia 3/B 25126 Brescia / IT | [1994/15] | Representative(s) | Cerbaro, Elena, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | Cerbaro, Elena, et al c/o Studio Torta, Via Viotti 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 93115921.4 | 01.10.1993 | [1994/15] | Priority number, date | IT1992TO00805 | 05.10.1992 Original published format: IT TO920805 | [1994/15] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0591871 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0591871 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/00 | [1994/15] | CPC: |
G01R31/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat zur Diagnose der elektrischen Anlage von Fahrzeugen | [1994/15] | English: | A method and apparatus for the diagnostic testing of electrical equipment of a vehicle | [1994/15] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour le diagnostique de l'équipement électrique d'un véhicule | [1994/15] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/49] | 15.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 16.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/18] | Request for further processing for: | 22.10.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 22.10.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.11.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.02.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3808559 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]); | [X]WO9004188 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [X] 1,15,16 * page 28 - page 31 * |