EP0647836 - Lifting apparatus with lower pulley without trailing cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/15] | Load-measuring device for lifting apparatuses | ||
[1997/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.1998 [1998/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABUS Kransysteme GmbH & Co. KG. Sonnenweg 1 51647 Gummersbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/15] | For all designated states ABUS Kransysteme GmbH & Co. KG. Sonnenweg 1 D-51647 Gummersbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bühne, Lothar Sonnenberg 27a D-51647 Gummersbach / DE | 02 /
Bube, Eckhard Immertweg 10 D-51647 Gummersbach/Lieberhausen / DE | [1995/15] | Representative(s) | Dörner, Lothar Patentanwälte Dörner & Kötter PartG mbB Körnerstrasse 27 58095 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/15] | Dörner, Lothar, Dipl.-Ing. Stresemannstrasse 15 D-58095 Hagen / DE | Application number, filing date | 93116141.8 | 06.10.1993 | [1995/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0647836 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0647836 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/18, B66C13/16 | [1997/14] | CPC: |
G01G23/3728 (EP);
G01G19/18 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/15] | G01G19/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [1995/15] | Title | German: | Hebezeug mit Unterflasche ohne Schleppkabel | [1997/14] | English: | Lifting apparatus with lower pulley without trailing cable | [1997/14] | French: | Machine de levage avec poulie basse sans câble d'enrouleur | [1997/14] |
Former [1995/15] | Lastmesseinrichtung für Hebezeuge | ||
Former [1995/15] | Load-measuring device for lifting apparatuses | ||
Former [1995/15] | Dispositif de mesure de charge pour machines de levage | Examination procedure | 01.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/15] | 05.03.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 26.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 13.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6149290 ; | [X]DE3111865 (MESS & WIEGETECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * page 9, paragraph 2; figure 3 *; | [XY]US4696359 (GLIBBERY ALBERT W [US]) [X] 1,4-6 * column A * * column 3, line 38 - line 50; figures 1-5 * [Y] 8-11; | [X]US5072798 (FRANKLIN SAMUEL H [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 17 - line 18; figure 6 *; | [Y] - "Mit dem Kran wiegen - ohne Haken und Oesen", WAGEN UND DOSIEREN., MAINZ DE, (198903), vol. 20, no. 2, pages 70 - 72, XP000081282 [Y] 8-11 * page 70, column R, paragraph L * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860723), vol. 10, no. 210, Database accession no. (P - 479), & JP61049290 A 19860311 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 2,3 * abstract * |