EP0604717 - Process for permanent waving of hair and composition therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.1998 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.1999 [1999/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wella Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Allee 65 64295 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/27] | For all designated states Wella Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Allee 65 D-64295 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mager, Herbert, Dr. 21, Route du Roule CH-1723 Marly / CH | 02 /
Clausen, Thomas, Dr. Ernst-Pasqué-Strasse 35 A D-64665 Alsbach / DE | 03 /
Hoch, Dietrich Riedstrasse 30 D-64319 Pfungstadt-Eich / DE | [1994/27] | Application number, filing date | 93116199.6 | 07.10.1993 | [1994/27] | Priority number, date | DE19924240471 | 02.12.1992 Original published format: DE 4240471 | [1994/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0604717 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0604717 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/09 | [1994/27] | CPC: |
A61Q5/04 (EP);
A61K8/416 (EP);
A61K8/8182 (EP);
A61K8/86 (EP);
A61K8/894 (EP);
A61K2800/5426 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur dauerhaften Haarverformung und Mittel zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | [1994/27] | English: | Process for permanent waving of hair and composition therefor | [1994/27] | French: | Procédé pour la déformation permanente des cheveux et composition pour la mise en oeuvre | [1994/27] | Examination procedure | 05.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 06.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/06] | 16.09.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1998 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4426376 (SHIRAKURA SACHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6,10 * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 7; claims 1-9 *; | [Y]EP0356665 (WELLA AG [DE]) [Y] 1-6,10 * page 2, line 35 - page 4, line 18; claims 1,4-9 *; | [Y]FR2080759 (GILLETTE CO [US]) [Y] 1-3,10 * example 3; claims 1-4,8 * |