EP0592000 - Surgical fastening apparatus with suture array [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06856 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirsch, Leon C. 83 Redcoat Road Westport, CT 06880 / US | 02 /
Green, David T. 28 Bermuda Road Westport, CT 06880 / US | 03 /
Bolanos, Henry 9 Tonetta Circle East Norwalk, CT 06855 / US | 04 /
Young, Wayne P. Allview Avenue Brewster, NY 10509 / US | 05 /
Mastri, Dominick L. 302 Cambridge Street Bridgeport, CT 06804 / US | 06 /
Heaton, Lisa W. 19 Devon Avenue Norwalk, CT 06850 / US | 07 /
Alari, Mark E. 33 Roosevelt Drive, Unit 422 Derby, CT 06418 / US | [1994/15] | Representative(s) | Marsh, Roy David, et al Hoffmann Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | Marsh, Roy David, et al Hoffmann Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93116352.1 | 08.10.1993 | [1994/15] | Priority number, date | US19920958392 | 08.10.1992 Original published format: US 958392 | [1994/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0592000 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0592000 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0592000 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072, A61B17/04 | [1994/15] | CPC: |
A61B17/072 (EP,US);
A61B17/04 (EP,US);
A61B17/0401 (EP,US);
A61B17/064 (EP,US);
A61B17/0643 (EP,US);
A61B17/42 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0454 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0458 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/15] | Title | German: | Mit Nahtmaterialanordnung vorgesehene chirurgische Klammervorrichtung | [1994/15] | English: | Surgical fastening apparatus with suture array | [1994/15] | French: | Appareil chirurgical d'attache avec réseau de sutures | [1994/15] | Examination procedure | 09.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/45] | 09.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 20.08.1997 | [2002/25] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4821939 (GREEN DAVID T [US]) [AD] 1 * figures 1,13 *; | [A]GB1095945 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP); | [A]WO9000370 (MIE MEDICAL RESEARCH LTD [GB]); | [A]US4841960 (GARNER ERIC T [US]) |