EP0598217 - Handgrip for the passenger compartment of vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Utescheny - Endos GmbH Breidinger Weg D-75059 Zaisenhausen / DE | [1994/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schäfer, Frank Adalbert-Stifter-Strasse 1 D-75056 Sulzfeld / DE | 02 /
Utescheny, Ralf Hildastrasse 207 D-75059 Zaisenhausen / DE | [1994/21] | Representative(s) | Clemens, Gerhard, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Müller, Clemens & Hach Lerchenstrasse 56 74074 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | Clemens, Gerhard, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Müller, Clemens & Hach Lerchenstrasse 56 D-74074 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 93116465.1 | 12.10.1993 | [1994/21] | Priority number, date | DE19920013972U | 16.10.1992 Original published format: DE 9213972 U | [1994/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0598217 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0598217 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60N3/02 | [1994/21] | CPC: |
B60N3/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT, SE [1994/21] | Title | German: | Haltegriff für Fahrzeuginnenräume | [1994/21] | English: | Handgrip for the passenger compartment of vehicles | [1994/21] | French: | Poignée pour l'habitecle de véhicules | [1994/21] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/50] | 21.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 08.01.1997 | PT | 08.04.1997 | SE | 08.04.1997 | [2008/05] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 08.01.1997 | |
PT | 08.04.1997 | ||
SE | 08.04.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | PT | 08.04.1997 | |
SE | 08.04.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | PT | 08.04.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE9200913U (SCHMIDT) [AD] 1 * page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 12; figures 1-2 *; | [A]DE8629205U (SCHMIDT) [A] 1 * page 9, line 15 - page 11, line 4; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE3219755 (PHILIPPINE KUNSTSTOFF GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0008315 (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE]); | [LPX]DE9213972U (UTESCHENY) [LPX] 1-9 |