EP0618434 - Method for measuring the radial forces of a sealing ring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.1997 [1997/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Carl Freudenberg Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states Firma Carl Freudenberg Höhnerweg 2-4 D-69469 Weinheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freitag, Edgar Stefanstrasse 34 D-34613 Schwalmstadt / DE | [1994/40] | Application number, filing date | 93116793.6 | 18.10.1993 | [1994/40] | Priority number, date | DE19934310509 | 31.03.1993 Original published format: DE 4310509 | [1994/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0618434 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0618434 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0618434 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01L5/00, G01M13/00 | [1995/02] | CPC: |
G01L5/0028 (EP);
G01M13/005 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/40] | G01L5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Messung der Radialkraft eines Dichtringes | [1994/40] | English: | Method for measuring the radial forces of a sealing ring | [1994/40] | French: | Méthode de mesure de la force radiale d'un anneau d'étanchéité | [1994/40] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/06] | 28.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2747262 (KUPFER ASBEST CO) [X] 1,2,4 * page 11, line 18 - page 12, line 12; figures 1,6,7; claim 1 *; | [X]CH462498 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 16; figures 1,3,5 *; | [A]CH401503 (GOETZEWERKE [DE]) [A] 3 * page 2, column L, line 17 - line 25; figure 4 * |