EP0596312 - Composite supplemental inflatable restraint doors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Corporation 8 Campus Drive Parsippany New Jersey 07054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states BASF CORPORATION 8 Campus Drive Parsippany, New Jersey 07054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shrewsburg, James E. 16656 Poplar Southgate, Michigan 48195 / US | 02 /
Winsky, Timothy S. 20246 Foxboro Riverview, Michigan 48192 / US | 03 /
Hass, James David 17890 Foxglen Riverview, Michigan 48192 / US | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Langfinger, Klaus Dieter, et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | Langfinger, Klaus-Dieter, Dr., et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 93116828.0 | 19.10.1993 | [1994/19] | Priority number, date | US19920972330 | 06.11.1992 Original published format: US 972330 | [1994/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0596312 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0596312 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0596312 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/79, B60R21/04, B60R21/20, // (C08G18/79, 101:00) | [1995/15] | CPC: |
B60R21/215 (EP);
C08G18/4072 (EP);
C08G18/797 (EP);
C08G2110/0008 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/19] | C08G18/79, B60R21/20, B60R21/04, // (C08G18/79, 101:00) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/19] | Title | German: | Abdeckung aus Verbundmaterial für Airbag-Aufprallschutzvorrichtung | [1994/19] | English: | Composite supplemental inflatable restraint doors | [1994/19] | French: | Couvercle en matière composite pour sac gonflable de retenue | [1994/19] | Examination procedure | 19.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/46] | 14.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 27.01.1999 | AT | 19.10.1999 | DK | 19.10.1999 | GB | 19.10.1999 | PT | 19.10.1999 | ES | 20.10.1999 | [2008/29] |
Former [2004/28] | SE | 27.01.1999 | |
AT | 19.10.1999 | ||
DK | 19.10.1999 | ||
GB | 19.10.1999 | ||
ES | 20.10.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | SE | 27.01.1999 | |
AT | 19.10.1999 | ||
DK | 19.10.1999 | ||
GB | 19.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/29] | SE | 27.01.1999 | |
AT | 19.10.1999 | ||
GB | 19.10.1999 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 19.10.1999 | |
GB | 19.10.1999 | ||
Former [2001/09] | GB | 19.10.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [AX]DE2922769 (PHOENIX AG) [A] 1,5 * example 1; claim 1 * [X] 4; | [XA]EP0149236 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 4,5 * page 22, line 18 - line 24; claims 1-3 * [A] 1; | [A]US4550153 (CARVER THOMAS G [US]) [A] 1,4,5 * claims 1,3,5; table 1 *; | [A]DE8915085U (TAKATA CORP.) [A] 1-3 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP0433889 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,4,5 * page 8, line 35 - line 39; claims 1,7 ** page 6, line 15 - line 18 *; | [PA]US5179132 (MIZUNO HISASHI [JP], et al) [PA] 1,4,5 * examples 1-4; claims 1,2 * |