EP0587197 - Arranging device in a body duct [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.1996 [1996/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANGIOMED AG Wachhausstrasse 6 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states ANGIOMED AG Wachhausstrasse 6 D-76227 Karlsruhe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindenberg, Josef Käthe-Kollwitzstr. 10a D-76227 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
Schnepp-Pesch, Wolfram Moltkestrasse 81 D-76185 Karlsruhe / DE | [1994/11] | Representative(s) | Lichti - Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bergwaldstrasse 1 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.rer.nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch Bergwaldstrasse 1 D-76227 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 93117016.1 | 11.10.1991 | [1994/11] | Priority number, date | DE19900014230U | 13.10.1990 Original published format: DE 9014230 U | [1994/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0587197 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/04 | [1994/11] | CPC: |
A61F2/92 (EP);
A61F2/07 (EP);
A61F2/88 (EP);
A61F2/885 (EP);
A61F2/90 (EP);
A61F2/91 (EP);
A61L31/128 (EP);
A61F2/89 (EP);
A61F2210/0019 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/11] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Anordnung in einer Körperröhre | [1994/11] | English: | Arranging device in a body duct | [1994/11] | French: | Dispositif d'agencement dans un conduit corporel | [1994/11] | Examination procedure | 04.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/28] | 13.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/19] | 06.12.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1996/19] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91117330.0 / EP0481365 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3868956 (ALFIDI RALPH J, et al) [A] 9-12 * column 7, line 67 - column 8, line 30; figures 11,12,14,15; claim 19 *; | [A]FR2257262 (SAUVAGE LESTER [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 12, line 12 - line 20; figures 1,2A; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0119688 (BALKO ALEXANDER [US], et al) [A] 9,11-14 * page 7, line 9 - page 8, line 17; figures 4,6-8 *; | [A]EP0282175 (COOK INC [US]); | [A]FR2617721 (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP]) [A] 9,11-14 * abstract *; | [XAY]US4856516 (HILLSTEAD RICHARD A [US]) [X] 1,9 * the whole document * [A] 2,3 [Y] 7,8,10-13; | [Y]WO9004982 (BIOCON OY [FI]) [Y] 7,8 * page 5, line 6 - line 8; figures 7A,7B,9A,9B *; | [A]WO9005554 (BOSTON SCIENT CORP [US]); | [YA]EP0380668 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [Y] 11-13 * page 29, line 5 - line 16 * * abstract * [A] 14; | [Y]US4955859 (ZILBER SERGE [US]) [Y] 10 * column 4, line 19 - line 28; figure 2 * |